Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Korean American Catholics Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Suh, Sun, against Jae Young Lee, Jung Ja Park, Keun Tak Pak, Kyum Kyu Hwang, Moon Sook Ho, (total of 12) See All represented by Geballe, Jonathan L, Geballe, Jonathan L., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with CHEREE A. BUGGS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHEREE A. BUGGS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management65 days |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time473 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 14, 2015SUMMONS
Date: July 06, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: Buggs, Hon. Cheree A. |
|
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE NOTE OF ISSUE DUE Judge: CHEREE A. BUGGS |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
June 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Compliance Conference Part Supreme Trial; NO APP (Conversion) Judge: Buggs, Hon. Cheree A. |
|
June 27, 2016 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE NO APP Judge: CHEREE A. BUGGS |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice for EBTs |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Demand for Expert Witness Information |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery-Inspection |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.