Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Selene Finance Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lin, En-Chia Anna, Soriano, Catalina Teresa, against Capital One Bank, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, Sarah Soogrim, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Sooklal Soogrim, (total of 5) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Allan B Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllan B Weiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time455 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 17, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part Judge: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. |
|
September 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: ALLAN B. WEISS |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE | |
August 19, 2016 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 09/23/2016Signed Before Justice: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. |
|
August 19, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION / CANCEL N. (Motion #001) Decided: 09/23/2016PD - ORDER SIGNED Before Justice: ALLAN B. WEISS Answer demanded: Yes Judge: ALLAN B. WEISS |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.