Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Clarke, Winston Clarke, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Paris, Jason L, against Jesus D. Orellana, Michael Polo, Randy A. Morillo, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Leonard Livote presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard Livote Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management152 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1651 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 08, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) motion to strike ni and exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2020 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #0010) PART 33 MOTIONS NAM (Conversion) Judge: Livote, Leonard |
|
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - MARKED OFF PT 33 MOTIONS NAM Judge: LEONARD LIVOTE |
|
November 19, 2019 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #0010) Decided: 12/03/2019Marked Off Before Justice: Livote, Leonard Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Livote, Leonard |
|
November 19, 2019 | Motion |
STRIKE (OTHER) (Motion #0010) Decided: 12/03/2019PD - MARKED OFF Before Justice: LEONARD LIVOTE Answer demanded: Yes Judge: LEONARD LIVOTE |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #010) includes exhibits includes exhibits Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
September 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #009) PART 33 MOTIONS Judge: Livote, Leonard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.