Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Devika Koobair, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Reilly, Thomas P., against American Dental Care, P.C., Kourosh Mehrnia Dds, represented by Goldfarb, Robyn S, Spiegel, William S, Woods, Justine Katherine, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with PETER J. O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePETER J. O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management47 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time193 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 31, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Discontinued Medical Malpractice STIP FILED 1-8-15 (Conversion) Judge: O'Donoghue, Hon. Peter |
|
January 11, 2016 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE MED MAL GENERAL PART STIP FILED 1-8-15 Judge: PETER J. O'DONOGHUE |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Part Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: O'Donoghue, Hon. Peter |
|
August 18, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD MED MAL PRELIM CONF Judge: PETER J. O'DONOGHUE |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Dental malpractice Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Dental malpractice Redacted |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ADMIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.