Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James Bruccoleri, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pomara, Francesco, against Crew Contracting Of Nj Inc, Liberty Construction & Restoration Corp, represented by Frittola, Michael Raymond, Kassirer, Paul L, Schirripa, Kimberly A, Marchese, Jeffrey Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Darrell L Gavrin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDarrell L Gavrin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management375 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1527 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 07, 2019THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 06, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 26, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 28, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 17, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2019ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 14, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 31, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 27, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 22, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
August 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Stay Lifted Compliance Conf Part PER SOS DTD 8/14/19, BY HON HEALY (Conversion) Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
August 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Post-Note) PART 13 PER SOS DTD 8/14/19, BY HON HEALY (Conversion) Judge: Compliance Conf Judge, |
|
August 14, 2019 | Hearing |
REMOVE STAY COMPLIANCE CONF PART PER SOS DTD 8/14/19 BY HON HEALY Judge: COMPLIANCE CONF JUDGE |
|
August 14, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP (POST-NOTE) PT 13 GEN CAL PER SOS DTD 8/14/19 BY HON HEALY Judge: COMPLIANCE CONF JUDGE |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Third Party Defendant Gravity Construction Corp's Counterclaim | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-FILING AUTHORIZATION STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.