Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gardy Dumesle, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Prakhin, Yuriy, against Ciro Taormina, Show Biz Trucking, Inc, represented by Callari, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Allan B Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllan B Weiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management221 days |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time337 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 03, 2016THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Preliminary Conference Part Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. |
|
May 23, 2016 | Hearing |
SETTLED PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PT 2 PRELIM CONF Judge: ALLAN B. WEISS |
|
May 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part Judge: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED PT 2 PRELIM CONF Judge: ALLAN B. WEISS |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER |
|
March 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part 022616 (Conversion) Judge: Weiss, Hon. Allan B. |
|
March 21, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: ALLAN B. WEISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.