Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Andrea V. Cummings A K A Andrea Cummings, John Doe And Mary Doe, Neville Cummings, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time183 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 01, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 01, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 18, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 21, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 25, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 9:30 AM - MANDATORY 4/23/14 AT 11:00 AM Judge: TONI CIMINO, CA-R |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION DISCONTINUING ACTION |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS STIPULATION ON CONSENT TO CANCEL LIS PENDENS |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Corrected* REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ANDREA CUMMINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.