Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilson Mendieta, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Horowitz, Chelsea Alexandra, Miklos, Joseph, Schultz, Michael David, against 338 West 39Th Street Llc, Barone Management Llc, Cbcs 39 Llc, Jmjc Holding Llc, represented by Bronstein, Joshua Reid, Evans, Therese Alberta, Klauber, Andrew L, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with CHEREE A. BUGGS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHEREE A. BUGGS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management196 days |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: September 06, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
March 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Contract for 510 W22nd Street Project |
||
March 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Affidavit of John Moore III |
||
March 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 21, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
March 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Cert of Ins 510 W22nd Street Project |
||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007) Reply to Monster's Cross-Motion and Owner Defendants' Third Cross-Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.