Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Emanuel Hartman Deceased, Marc B. Hartman As Administrator Of The Estate Of, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Truhowsky, Deborah N F, against Fairview Nursing Care Center, Inc., North Shore - Long Island Jewish Health System, Inc., represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Laird, Scott James, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Leonard Livote presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard Livote Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management381 days |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1342 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2015ANSWER
Date: April 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Filing Petition for Allocation and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds with Surrogate's Cou ... show more Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proof of Filing Petition for Allocation and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds with Surrogate's Cou ... show more Redacted |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPROMISE ORDER (CPLR 1207) (PROPOSED) | |
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G LIEN LETTERS |
|
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F FUNERAL BILL |
|
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E EXPENSES TO CASE |
|
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D OFFER LETTER |
|
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C STIP OF DISCONT |
|
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G part of G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.