Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Pnc Bank, National Association, Successor By Merger To National City Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., against Bank Of America, N.A., John Doe And Jane Doe Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, New York Community Bank, Roger Lee, Victory-Fiedler Apartments, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Raindorf, Ben Zev, Sheehan, Kenneth M, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Pam Jackman-Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePam Jackman-Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 29, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) SUBMIT ORDER FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE WITH JUDGES DECISION |
||
December 27, 2023 |
DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #001) MEMORANDUM |
||
November 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AFF OF MAILING WITH MOTION NOTICE |
||
July 21, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #001) MOTION SUBMISSION FORM FOR THE 07/24/2023 MOTION DATE |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) AFF OF MERIT |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE ORDER |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) STIPULATION TO REMIVE BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) NOTE |
||
July 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.