Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association Fannie Mae, A Corporation Organized And Existing Under The Laws Of The United States Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Ian Harris, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions221 days |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time262 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 13, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 13, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 04, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 13, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 07, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: November 10, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 08, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 13, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 08, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2014ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 10, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 02, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 24, 2015ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: October 05, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 30, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 07, 2017ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: October 28, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Post Disposition - Settled PART 38 Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
October 20, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - SETTLED PT 38 CONFERENCE Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
September 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #005) Centralized Motion Part Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
September 18, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
September 08, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #005) Decided: 09/29/2017Granted Before Justice: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
September 08, 2017 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION / CANCEL N. (Motion #005) Decided: 09/29/2017PD - MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: CARMEN VELASQUEZ Answer demanded: Yes Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.