Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Onewest Bank, N.A. F K A Onewest Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against City Of New York Department Of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Janie Leake, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions264 days |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time264 days |
MEMORANDUM
Date: February 20, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 01, 2014RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 01, 2014JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 08, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 06, 2014ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 28, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Additional Affidavit of Publication |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM MEMO SIGNED |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
November 14, 2014 | Motion |
Judgment - Foreclosure & Sale (Motion #002) Decided: 11/19/2014Closed Before Justice: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
November 14, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) EXPARTE Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
November 14, 2014 | Motion |
JUDGEMENT-FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002) Decided: 11/19/2014CASEDISP-EXP ORDER GRANTED Before Justice: AUGUSTUS C. AGATE Answer demanded: No Judge: AUGUSTUS C. AGATE |
|
November 14, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) EXPARTE Judge: AUGUSTUS C. AGATE |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.