Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, against John Doe And Jane Doe, Nagela Arcelin, New York City Environmental Control Board, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2014 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time219 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 29, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 23, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER SIGNED CONFERENCE ORDER |
|
October 01, 2014 | Hearing |
Settled FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D Supreme Trial; NOAP (Conversion) Judge: Grays, Hon. Marguerite A. |
|
October 01, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D NOAP Judge: MARGUERITE A. GRAYS |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
July 02, 2014 | Hearing |
Continued FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Grays, Hon. Marguerite A. |
|
July 02, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D Judge: MARGUERITE A. GRAYS |
|
June 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Continued FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D Supreme Initial (first time on); NOAP, 05/23/14 AT 10:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Grays, Hon. Marguerite A. |
|
June 18, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART D NOAP 05/23/14 AT 10:00 AM Judge: MARGUERITE A. GRAYS |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE NON PARTICIPATION FOR DEFENDANT NAGELA ARCELIN. MUST VIEW QCC MINUTES ALSO FOR FILINGS |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.