Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crystal Leach As Administrator D.B.N. Of The Estate Of Ethel Generette, Deceased, Crystal Leach As Administrator D.B.N. Of The Estate Of Ethel Generette, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Truhowsky, Deborah N F, against Hollis Operating Co., Llc, Holliswood Care Center, Inc., Holliswood Center For Rehabilitation And Healthcare, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, Queens Hospital Center, (total of 5) See All represented by Capell, Jesse Daniel, Crawford, Andrea Lyn, Drummond, Kaitlin Stavnitsky, Pepkin, Cari Ellen, Robin, Caitlin A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Allan B Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllan B Weiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management95 days |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time965 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 29, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 21, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2017 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 20, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 07, 2017 |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM JOINT PROPOSED ORDER FOR COMPROMISE PURUANT TO EPTL 5-4.6 |
||
March 03, 2017 | Motion |
Compromise (Motion #003) Decided: 01/17/2017Signed Before Justice: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin Answer demanded: No Judge: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin |
|
March 03, 2017 | Motion |
COMPROMISE ACTION/CLAIM (Motion #003) Decided: 01/17/2017PD-COMPROMISE ORDER SIGNED Before Justice: KEVIN KERRIGAN Answer demanded: No Judge: KEVIN KERRIGAN |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) EXPARTE INFANT COMP ORDER (Conversion) Judge: Kerrigan, Hon. Kevin |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #003) EXPARTE INFANT COMP ORDER Judge: KEVIN KERRIGAN |
|
January 03, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F LIENS OF MEDICAID AND MEDICARE |
||
January 03, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E FUNERAL BILL |
||
January 03, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D DISBURSEMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.