Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wallace, Lisa L, against John Doe #1 To John Doe #10, Tara Shakoo, Venice Hutcherson, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Augustus C Agate presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAugustus C Agate Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time555 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER SIGNED |
|
February 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #002) Centralized Motion Part E/F, E/F (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
February 04, 2015 | Hearing |
PD - FULLY SUBMITTED NO OPP CENTRALIZED MOTION PART E/F E/F Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #002) Exhibits A-B |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
December 31, 2014 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #002) Decided: 02/20/2015Granted Before Justice: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.