Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Comm-Ucc case in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts with Agate, Hon. Augustus C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAgate, Hon. Augustus C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2014 |
CategoryComm-Ucc |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2014 | Hearing |
Discontinued Preliminary Conference Part Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
April 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Part Supreme Initial (first time on); M/RESTO (Conversion) Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part 040914, *MSO 3/25/14 (Conversion) Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Centralized Motion Part SEE COMM, 5-6-14 9:30 P/C (Conversion) Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
|
March 25, 2014 | Motion |
Injunction/Restraining Order (Motion #001) Decided: 05/29/2014Denied Before Justice: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Agate, Hon. Augustus C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.