Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mark Kramer, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Manos, Charles A, against Town Of Patterson, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property - Scar |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SCAR PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 08, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 ER60464 Filing |
||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3a ER60464 Property Analysis Key |
||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 ER60464 Town of Patterson |
||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 ER60464 Property Analysis |
||
November 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2a ER60464 Filing RPTL |
||
September 23, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 16, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 28, 2021 | SCAR PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.