Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Victor G. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G. Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2015 |
CategoryOm-Mechanic'S Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
Case Cycle Time270 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Victor G. Grossman CROSS MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
December 19, 2014 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #001) Decided: 01/30/2015Granted Before Justice: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
December 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Victor G. Grossman Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
December 18, 2014 | Motion |
Cross Motion (Motion #002) Decided: 01/30/2015Denied Before Justice: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
April 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Victor G. Grossman
Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.