Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Madeline Jackel, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Cohen, Steven Howard, against Zorba Diner Inc, represented by Cardali, Wendy K, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Victor G Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Court case settled |
||
April 04, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 04, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 16, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 22, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
October 25, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
September 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Zorba Diner Inc |
||
September 13, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.