Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Amanda Lapeccerella, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 05, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1408205 |
||
November 05, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1408205 |
||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1408205 | ||
November 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1408205 |
||
September 28, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.