Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Auto Finance Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Gregory J Moravec, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGina C Capone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
April 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
April 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 01, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 28, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 09, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.