Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Maria L Sawicki, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas R Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas R Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | ||
September 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 DECISION AND ORDER |
||
September 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 25, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. Thomas R. Davis, J.S.C. on August 23, 2022. |
||
April 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.