Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Thomas H Robb Jr, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
November 30, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 30, 2021 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
November 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 30, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
October 13, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
August 25, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.