Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Joseph Massaro, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Davis, Stephen, against Town Of Carmel, represented by Costello, Thomas J., in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI)
Date: July 28, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Add'l, add'l proof of service |
||
August 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Add'l proof of service; signed |
||
July 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.