Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A. And Keith Taplin And Nancy Newbold For An Order Cancelling Of Record A Satisfaction Of Mortgage Pursuant To New York Real Property Law 329, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Toscano, Thomas A, against ..., in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts Putnam County Supreme Court with Robert Dibella presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Dibella Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Cancellation Of Instrumen) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HousePutnam County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time352 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 14, 2016PETITION
Date: December 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Calendar Clerk Dept NO APPEARANCE, CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Service on Putnam County Clerk |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Satisfaction |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Cancellation of Instrument of Record; RPL Section 329 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.