Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against John M Connolly, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
August 19, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 11, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
June 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 03, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT John M Connolly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.