Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Natalie Doherty, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maurer, Ira M, against Maia Schumann Keller, Pamela T Schumann, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Grossman, Hon. Victor G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrossman, Hon. Victor G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 27, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Hearing |
Teams
Judge: Grossman, Hon. Victor G. |
|
August 31, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 27, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
July 27, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
July 27, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media Information |
||
July 27, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Medicare, Medicaid and Social Security Benefits |
||
July 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
July 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
July 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
July 12, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.