Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lake Plaza Shopping Center Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Scherer, Martin W, against Kmart Corporation, represented by Barr, Beverly Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts Putnam County Supreme Court with Robert Dibella presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Dibella Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Lease Rescission Etc.) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HousePutnam County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time372 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
DiBella, Robert M. 9:30 PAPERS/APPEAR, STIP OF DISCONT (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
November 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned DiBella, Robert M. 9:30 PAPERS/APPEAR, STIP OF DISCONT (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
November 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned DiBella, Robert M. 9:30 PAPERS ONLY, STIP OF DISCONT (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
October 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned DiBella, Robert M. 9:30 CC (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
May 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned DiBella, Robert M. 9:30 PC, PER D&O (Conversion) Judge: DiBella, Hon. Robert M. |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed form of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.