Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gb, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cantarero, Jonathan, Herman, Jeffrey Marc, Sattar, Yusuf, Silvershein, Andrew Todd, Williams, Wayne Allen, (total of 5) See All against Green Chimneys Children'S Service, Inc., Green Chimneys Childrens Service Inc, represented by Rutherford, David S, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Leonard D Steinman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D Steinman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 26, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: May 26, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 26, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 03, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 28, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 14, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2022SUMMONS
Date: May 26, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 28, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 27, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
August 31, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Brief with Certification |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Exhibit 2 - Depo of M.R. |
||
August 18, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) B.G. - SOMF |
||
August 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) B.G. - Aff in Opp - Final by ADS |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript of Timothy Tuttle |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Exhibit 4 - Decision - Kamerman v. Westchester Day School |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Edward Placke |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Exhibit 5 - Decision - Keith Blanchard v. Moravia Central School District |
||
August 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Exhibit 6 - Decision - J. F. v. Basilian Fathers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.