Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Cynthia Odonnell, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 23, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
September 28, 2021 | Affidavit of Purchase and Sale of Account by Debt Buyer Plaintiff (Debt Buyer Actions) | ||
September 28, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
September 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
July 28, 2021 | 202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE | ||
June 29, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
June 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 14, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.