Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Rooney, Timothy F, Sheerin, John J, against Khristian Harrow, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice Discontinuing Action with prejudice |
||
July 15, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) stipulation of settlement |
||
June 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
May 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-KHRISTIAN HARROW-47614250 |
||
May 28, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
May 13, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
May 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit(s) |
||
May 13, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.