Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Richard H Sporbert Jr, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 01, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 31, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFF OF FACTS |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B CHARGE OFF STATEMENT |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFF OF FACTS |
||
March 31, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.