Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The County Of Putnam, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Herodes, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Art 11 Tax Foreclosure) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 14, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
July 14, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF WITHDRAWAL |
||
July 13, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REPLY AFFIDAVIT |
||
July 13, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF REDEMPTION |
||
July 13, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
July 01, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF REDEMPTION |
||
July 01, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
June 21, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF WITHDRAWAL |
||
June 09, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF REDEMPTIONS |
||
May 05, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF REDEMPTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.