Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Stephenie Maglio, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 20, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
August 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor |
||
August 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
August 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 20, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
March 09, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
February 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 22, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.