Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Creative Kids Childcare Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brooks, Jordan M, Goodhouse, Brendan Markham, Grauer, Joshua Jacob, against Csfb 2007-C4 Lakeview Plaza Shopping Center, Llc, represented by Corrigan, Daniel Farrell, Slama, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts Putnam County Supreme Court with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2017 |
CategoryComm-Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HousePutnam County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time279 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 01, 2017REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 17, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 01, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: February 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 24, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 20, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 13, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 17, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: April 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 20, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: May 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 16, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 21, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 12, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 17, 2017STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 10, 2017THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 10, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 09, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 13, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: March 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 25, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 04, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: April 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: February 02, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: February 02, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2A)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 26, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2017COURT NOTICE
Date: November 03, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: October 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2017RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Paul I. Marx Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Paul I. Marx Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 New Lease |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Memorandum of Lease |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 First Termination Notice dated Apr. 7, 2017 |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Second Termination Notice dated May 24, 2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.