Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ricky Nelson Ventura, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stafford, Daniel Cade, against Mark Hamilton Ventura, represented by Manzella, Stephen Mark, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Victor G Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor G Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Partition Action) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 22, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 01, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed PLC Order |
||
May 10, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer to Counterclaims |
||
May 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 30, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 19, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims |
||
March 25, 2021 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service |
||
March 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 22, 2021 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) First Amended Verified Complaint |
||
March 22, 2021 |
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.