Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Charles Pritchard, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 17, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 17, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 17, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
May 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
May 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
May 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
May 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
May 17, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
February 12, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
February 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.