Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cpd Ny Energy Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kraut, Jonathan D, Lang, Andrew C, against Florys Corp, Gas Land Petroleum Inc, Gjp Enterprises Inc, Mitch Nesheiwat, represented by Castiglione, Joseph Francis, Clarke, Edward Hyde, Magana, Amanda Lynn Tamas, Phillips, Edward J, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas R Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas R Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 25, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 08, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation So Ordered by the Hon. Thomas R. Davis, J.S.C. on March 7, 2022. |
||
February 23, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Justice Davis Modifying Previously Set Discovery Deadlines 2.23.22 |
||
February 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 15, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Notice of Appeal of Order dated 1.31.22 |
||
February 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 01, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of entry of decision and order dated 01/31/2022 |
||
January 31, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Decision and Order signed by the Hon. Thomas R. Davis, J.S.C. on January 31, 2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.