Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Lucille F Pennatto, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 12, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
February 05, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.