Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against A K A Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, Aka Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, Curtis Heintz A K A Curtis H Heintz And Old Albany Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Gina C Capone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGina C Capone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Notice of Entry of Judgment entered 7/26/23 | ||
August 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 26, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Balance Statement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 | Affirmation in Support | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Non-Military Service Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Last Payment Statement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Agreement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavits of Service of S&C - Additional Mailings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.