Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, NY, . Putnam County, NY Superior Courts with Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZugibe, Hon. Thomas P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPutnam County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Janet C. Malone
Judge: Malone, Hon. Janet C. |
|
April 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Janet C. Malone - Motion Part Judge: Malone, Hon. Janet C. |
|
April 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Janet C. Malone - Motion Part Judge: Malone, Hon. Janet C. |
|
March 16, 2018 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 05/04/2018Closed Before Justice: Malone, Hon. Janet C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Malone, Hon. Janet C. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Janet C. Malone Supreme Trial, 9:30 CONF (Conversion) Judge: Malone, Hon. Janet C. |
|
November 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Paul I. Marx Supreme Trial, 9:30 COMPLIANCE CONF (Conversion) Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
May 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Paul I. Marx Supreme Initial (first time on), 9:30 PLC (Conversion) Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.