Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Vanessa Servo, represented by Terry, Walter L., in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 05, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 05, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 05, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 05, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 03, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 23, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Order |
||
December 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Affidavit |
||
December 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Invoice |
||
December 23, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Judgment Proposed to County Clerk |
||
December 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Aff of Mailing/Service |
||
December 23, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTY AFF & COST |
||
December 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 14, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order for Summary Judgment |
||
December 03, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.