Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Francesco N Chiodo, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: May 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 NOTICE OF DEFAULT R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
March 10, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTY AFF & COST |
||
March 10, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1388376 |
||
May 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
May 07, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.