Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Radames Jr, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Secondary Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
July 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 30, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
July 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 12, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTY AFF & COST |
||
July 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
July 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.