Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Mary Lou Smith, represented by Resnick, Joshua Colin, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 02, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 29, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
January 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.