Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Trina M Finch, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Michael V Coccoma presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael V Coccoma Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions186 days |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: April 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 15, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 02, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 02, 2019 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 29, 2019 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Attorneys fees awarded of $840.25 |
||
April 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
April 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Pre-Other Coccoma (Court Activity) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
April 15, 2019 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
April 15, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 15, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 15, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.