Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Seth Edson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Feldman, Jodi Paige, against Michael Oleary, Todd Gohde, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time243 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2018NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2019 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 07, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Affidavits of Service on Defendants |
||
September 05, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 24, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 30, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.