Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCoccoma, Hon. Michael V. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management504 days |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time609 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Marked Off Coccoma (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Coccoma (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
February 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #003) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #003) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 03/13/2019Decided Before Justice: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. Answer demanded: No Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre-Note of Issue Restoration Coccoma (Court Activity) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Coccoma (Court Activity) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #002) Coccoma (Motion Part) Judge: Coccoma, Hon. Michael V. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.