Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Oneonta Housing Company L P, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case against Assessor And Board Of Assessment Review, City Of Oneonta New York, in the jurisdiction of Otsego County, NY, . Otsego County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOtsego County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 07, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Stipulation and Order of Settlement |
||
January 05, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order of Settlement |
||
January 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 30, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 20, 2020 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
November 20, 2020 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
June 29, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
June 26, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
June 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MISC |
||
September 21, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER-SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.