Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pathfinder Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Pauline J Scheinert, Scheinert William C Sr Aka, William C Aka Scheinert A K A William C Scheinert Sr., in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 21, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
July 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 29, 2022 | Affidavit of Posting | ||
July 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
July 29, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
July 29, 2022 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
July 29, 2022 | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | ||
July 29, 2022 | Memorandum of Sale | ||
June 16, 2022 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
June 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.